PA HB2862 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-26 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-26 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 15, 1933 (P.L.565, No.111), known as the Department of Banking and Securities Code, in banking and securities, further providing for fund.
Title
In banking and securities, further providing for fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2862 PN 4375, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - House - House Floor: HB 2862 PN 4375, 2019 A7383, KRUEGER (Y: 100 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-09-17 - House - House Commerce: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2862 PN 4375, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - House - House Floor: HB 2862 PN 4375, 2019 A7383, KRUEGER (Y: 100 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-09-17 - House - House Commerce: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-26 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |
2020-10-19 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-10-19 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-10-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-09-30 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-09-30 | House | Second consideration |
2020-09-29 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-17 | House | First consideration |
2020-09-17 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-09-15 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |