PA HB285 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-17 - Referred to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Titles 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) and 61 (Prisons and Parole) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in judicial boards and commissions, further providing for powers and duties, for adoption of guidelines for sentencing, for adoption of guidelines for county intermediate punishment, for adoption of guidelines for State intermediate punishment and for adoption of risk assessment instrument; in sentencing, further providing for sentencing generally, for collection of restitution, reparation, fees, costs, fines and penalties, for order of probation, for sentence of partial confinement, for sentence of total confinement, for sentence of county intermediate punishment, for information required upon commitment and subsequent disposition, for modification or revocation of order of probation, for court-imposed sanctions for offenders violating probation, for modification or revocation of county intermediate punishment sentence and for revocation of State intermediate punishment sentence; in county intermediate punishment, further providing for county intermediate punishment programs and for continued eligibility; in motivational boot camp, further providing for definitions, for selection of inmate participants and for motivational boot camp program; in State intermediate punishment, further providing scope of chapter, for definitions, for referral to State intermediate punishment program, for drug offender treatment program and for reports; in recidivism risk reduction incentive, further providing for definitions, for evaluation and for reports; in Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole, further providing for definitions, for advisory committee, for general powers of board, for probation services, for parole power, providing for short sentence parole, further providing for violation of terms of parole and for parole procedure; and making conforming amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In judicial boards and commissions, further providing for powers and duties, for adoption of guidelines for sentencing, for adoption of guidelines for county intermediate punishment, for adoption of guidelines for State intermediate punishment and for adoption of risk assessment instrument; in sentencing, further providing for sentencing generally, for collection of restitution, reparation, fees, costs, fines and penalties, for order of probation, for sentence of partial confinement, for sentence of total confinement, for sentence of county intermediate punishment, for information required upon commitment and subsequent disposition, for modification or revocation of order of probation, for court-imposed sanctions for offenders violating probation, for modification or revocation of county intermediate punishment sentence and for revocation of State intermediate punishment sentence; in county intermediate punishment, further providing for county intermediate punishment programs and for continued eligibility; in motivational boot camp, further providing for definitions, for selection of inmate participants and for motivational boot camp program; in State intermediate punishment, further providing scope of chapter, for definitions, for referral to State intermediate punishment program, for drug offender treatment program and for reports; in recidivism risk reduction incentive, further providing for definitions, for evaluation and for reports; in Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole, further providing for definitions, for advisory committee, for general powers of board, for probation services, for parole power, providing for short sentence parole, further providing for violation of terms of parole and for parole procedure; and making conforming amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 285 PN 4272, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 285 PN 2197, A2893, MARTIN AMENDMENT NO. A-2893 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Floor: HB 285 PN 271, FP (Y: 144 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-17HouseReferred to RULES
2018-10-17HouseIn the House
2018-10-17SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-1)
2018-10-16SenateRemoved from table
2018-10-16SenateLaid on the table
2018-10-16SenateAmended on third consideration
2018-06-20SenateRemoved from table
2018-06-20SenateLaid on the table
2018-05-23SenateRemoved from table
2017-11-14SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2017-10-02SenateRemoved from table
2017-09-20SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2017-07-09SenateAmended on third consideration (48-1)
2017-07-08SenateRe-reported as committed
2017-07-08SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-07-08SenateSecond consideration
2017-06-30SenateFirst consideration
2017-06-30SenateReported as amended
2017-03-24SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2017-03-20SenateIn the Senate
2017-03-20HouseThird consideration and final passage (144-51)
2017-03-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-03-13HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-03-13HouseSecond consideration
2017-02-08HouseRemoved from table
2017-02-07HouseLaid on the table
2017-02-07HouseFirst consideration
2017-02-07HouseReported as committed
2017-02-01HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=285
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0285&pn=0271
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0285&pn=2197
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0285&pn=2221
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0285&pn=4272
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=02/07/2017&RollCallId=49
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=87
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/20/2017&RollCallId=99
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=06/30/2017&RollCallId=380
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=07/08/2017&RollCallId=406
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=225
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=726

Bill Comments

feedback