PA HB2832 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 33-4)
Status: Introduced on August 31 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-11-20 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, providing for event venue indoor space operation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for event venue indoor space operation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-17 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A07164 (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - House - House Commerce: To Table (Y: 9 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-09-17 - House - House Commerce: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-20HouseLaid on the table
2020-11-20HouseRemoved from table
2020-09-17HouseLaid on the table
2020-09-17HouseFirst consideration
2020-09-17HouseReported as amended
2020-08-31HouseReferred to COMMERCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2832
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2832&pn=4311
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2832&pn=4397
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=09/17/2020&RollCallId=2475
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=09/17/2020&RollCallId=2477
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=09/17/2020&RollCallId=2473
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=09/17/2020&RollCallId=2479

Bill Comments

feedback