PA HB283 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-24 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-24 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of February 14, 2008 (P.L.6, No.3), known as the Right-to-Know Law, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in procedure, further providing for written requests; and, in judicial review, further providing for fee limitations.
Title
In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in procedure, further providing for written requests; and, in judicial review, further providing for fee limitations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House Floor: HB 283 PN 3150, FP (Y: 177 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House Floor: HB 283 PN 1736, 2019 A3202, SIMMONS (Y: 193 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A01181 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House Floor: HB 283 PN 3150, FP (Y: 177 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House Floor: HB 283 PN 1736, 2019 A3202, SIMMONS (Y: 193 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A01181 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-24 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-01-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (177-15) |
2020-01-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-01-15 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-01-15 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2020-01-14 | House | Removed from table |
2020-01-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-23 | House | Removed from table |
2019-06-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-18 | House | Removed from table |
2019-05-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-05-06 | House | First consideration |
2019-05-06 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |