PA HB2806 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Engrossed on September 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-20 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-20 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in general powers and duties of the Department of Public Welfare, providing for COVID-19 mental health public awareness campaign.
Title
In general powers and duties of the Department of Public Welfare, providing for COVID-19 mental health public awareness campaign.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2806 PN 3443, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-09-12 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2806 PN 3443, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-09-12 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-20 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2022-09-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-09-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2022-09-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-09-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-09-19 | House | Second consideration |
2022-09-14 | House | Removed from table |
2022-09-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-09-12 | House | First consideration |
2022-09-12 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-09-09 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |