PA HB2800 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 143 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 143 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 20, 1985 (P.L.457, No.112), known as the Medical Practice Act of 1985, further providing for prosthetists, orthotists, pedorthists and orthotic fitters.
Title
Further providing for prosthetists, orthotists, pedorthists and orthotic fitters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2800 PN 3436, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-18 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2800 PN 3436, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-12 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-18 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2800 PN 3436, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-12 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-03 | Senate | Act No. 143 of 2022 |
2022-11-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2022-10-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Signed in House |
2022-10-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2022-10-25 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-10-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-10-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-10-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-10-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-09-19 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2022-09-19 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-09-19 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2022-09-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-09-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-09-14 | House | Second consideration |
2022-09-13 | House | Removed from table |
2022-09-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-09-12 | House | First consideration |
2022-09-12 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-09-06 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |