PA HB28 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 56-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Titles 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) and 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in matters affecting government units, providing for exceptions to governmental immunity related to unauthorized aliens; and, in preemptions, providing for restriction on municipal regulation of official and employee communications relating to immigration status.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In matters affecting government units, providing for exceptions to governmental immunity related to unauthorized aliens; and, in preemptions, providing for restriction on municipal regulation of official and employee communications relating to immigration status.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-13 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended A01849 (Y: 15 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A01819 (Y: 0 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-13 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A01807 (Y: 11 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-13 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A01849 (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22HouseRemoved from table
2018-05-22HouseLaid on the table
2018-01-24HouseRemoved from table
2017-10-24HouseLaid on the table
2017-10-24HouseRemoved from table
2017-09-08HouseLaid on the table
2017-09-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-13HouseRe-committed to RULES
2017-06-13HouseFirst consideration
2017-06-13HouseReported as amended
2017-04-03HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=28
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0028&pn=1213
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0028&pn=2006
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=06/13/2017&RollCallId=583
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=06/13/2017&RollCallId=584
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=06/13/2017&RollCallId=585
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=06/13/2017&RollCallId=582

Bill Comments

feedback