PA HB2792 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-02 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-02 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for a long-term care medical director registry and imposing duties on the Department of Health and the Department of Human Services.
Title
Providing for a long-term care medical director registry and imposing duties on the Department of Health and the Department of Human Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - House - House Floor: HB 2792 PN 4307, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - House - House Floor: HB 2792 PN 4307, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-02 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2020-09-30 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-09-30 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-09-30 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-09-29 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-09-29 | House | Second consideration |
2020-09-17 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-16 | House | First consideration |
2020-09-16 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-08-31 | House | Referred to HEALTH |