PA HB2779 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Introduced on August 18 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-17 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for retaining health care innovations during the COVID-19 pandemic and imposing duties on the Joint State Government Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for retaining health care innovations during the COVID-19 pandemic and imposing duties on the Joint State Government Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-16 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A07152 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A07163 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-17HouseRemoved from table
2020-09-16HouseLaid on the table
2020-09-16HouseFirst consideration
2020-09-16HouseReported as amended
2020-08-18HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2779
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2779&pn=4257
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2779&pn=4382
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=09/16/2020&RollCallId=2453
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=09/16/2020&RollCallId=2454
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=09/16/2020&RollCallId=2455

Bill Comments

feedback