PA HB276 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 38-18)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Passed Sessions of 2018 and 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, providing for rights of victims of crime.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, providing for rights of victims of crime.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 276 PN 284, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Floor: HB 276 PN 284, FP (Y: 190 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor: HB 276 PN 284, 2019 A107, D. MILLER (Y: 86 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor: HB 276 PN 284, 2019 A114, DAWKINS (Y: 86 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor: HB 276 PN 284, 2019 A113, DAWKINS (Y: 86 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor: HB 276 PN 284, 2019 A111, DAWKINS (Y: 86 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Judiciary: To Table (Y: 9 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenatePassed Sessions of 2018 and 2019
2019-06-20SenatePamphlet Laws Resolution No. 1
2019-06-20SenateFiled in the Office of the Secretary of the Commonwealth
2019-06-19SenateSigned in Senate
2019-06-19SenateSigned in House
2019-06-19SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2019-06-18SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-06-17SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-17SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-11SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-11SenateReported as committed
2019-06-05SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2019-04-08SenateIn the Senate
2019-04-08HouseThird consideration and final passage (190-8)
2019-04-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-03-11HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-03-11HouseSecond consideration
2019-02-21HouseRemoved from table
2019-02-21HouseLaid on the table
2019-02-21HouseFirst consideration
2019-02-21HouseReported as committed
2019-02-01HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=276
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0276&pn=0284
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=02/21/2019&RollCallId=49
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=02/21/2019&RollCallId=50
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=59
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=60
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=61
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=62
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=148
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/08/2019&RollCallId=245
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=06/11/2019&RollCallId=266
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/18/2019&RollCallId=366
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=158

Bill Comments

feedback