PA HB274 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-12)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in protection from abuse, further providing for relief.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In protection from abuse, further providing for relief.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-19 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00529 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23HouseRemoved from table
2018-05-23HouseLaid on the table
2018-02-05HouseRemoved from table
2018-02-05HouseLaid on the table
2017-10-26HouseRemoved from table
2017-10-26HouseLaid on the table
2017-09-12HouseRemoved from table
2017-09-12HouseLaid on the table
2017-06-21HouseRemoved from table
2017-06-21HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-08HouseRemoved from table
2017-04-19HouseLaid on the table
2017-04-19HouseFirst consideration
2017-04-19HouseReported as amended
2017-01-31HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback