PA HB273 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in realty transfer tax, correcting a scrivener's error relating to credits against tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In realty transfer tax, correcting a scrivener's error relating to credits against tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Floor: HB 273 PN 244, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18SenateReferred to FINANCE
2021-03-16SenateIn the Senate
2021-03-16HouseThird consideration and final passage (202-0)
2021-03-16HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-03-15HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-03-15HouseSecond consideration
2021-02-05HouseRemoved from table
2021-02-04HouseLaid on the table
2021-02-04HouseFirst consideration
2021-02-04HouseReported as committed
2021-01-26HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback