PA HB273 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 39-20)
Status: Engrossed on September 25 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-10-02 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 25 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-10-02 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act authorizing public school districts to implement senior local tax reduction incentive volunteer exchange programs.
Title
Authorizing public school districts to implement senior local tax reduction incentive volunteer exchange programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-09-25 - House - HB 273 PN 3668, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-02 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2012-09-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2012-09-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2012-09-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-06-29 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-06-29 | House | Second consideration |
2012-06-29 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-06-06 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2012-06-06 | House | First consideration |
2012-06-06 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-04-06 | House | Re-referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES |
2011-04-06 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES |
2011-01-27 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |