PA HB271 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-17 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-17 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act providing for earned income tax credit notification.
Title
Providing for earned income tax credit notification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-16 - House - HB 271 PN 2158, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 122 N: 74 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-15 - House - HB 271 PN 290, 2009 A1687, ELLIS (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-15 - House - HB 271 PN 290, 2009 A1687, ELLIS (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-17 | Referred to FINANCE | |
2009-06-16 | In the Senate | |
2009-06-16 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-06-15 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2009-06-15 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-06-15 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-06-15 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-06-09 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2009-06-09 | First consideration | |
2009-06-09 | Reported as committed | |
2009-02-05 | Referred to FINANCE |