PA HB2709 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on July 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-11 - Act No. 82 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on July 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-11 - Act No. 82 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in particular rights and immunities, further providing for definitions, for lessee's right to acquire ownership and for advertising and display of property.
Title
In particular rights and immunities, further providing for definitions, for lessee's right to acquire ownership and for advertising and display of property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-08 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2709 PN 3378, Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-08 - House - House Floor: HB 2709 PN 3378, CONCUR (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-07-06 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-01 - House - House Floor: HB 2709 PN 3309, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2709 PN 3378, Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-08 - House - House Floor: HB 2709 PN 3378, CONCUR (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-07-06 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-01 - House - House Floor: HB 2709 PN 3309, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-11 | House | Act No. 82 of 2022 |
2022-07-11 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2022-07-11 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2022-07-08 | House | Signed in Senate |
2022-07-08 | House | Signed in House |
2022-07-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (199-0) |
2022-07-08 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2022-07-08 | House | Referred to RULES |
2022-07-08 | House | In the House |
2022-07-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (35-15) |
2022-07-08 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2022-07-08 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-07-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-07-06 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-07-05 | Senate | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |
2022-07-01 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-07-01 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2022-07-01 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-30 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-30 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-30 | House | Second consideration |
2022-06-28 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2022-06-28 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-28 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-06-24 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |