PA HB270 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-17)
Status: Enrolled on October 18 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-10-18 - Presented to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of August 26, 1971 (P.L.351, No.91), known as the State Lottery Law, in pharmaceutical assistance for the elderly, further providing for definitions, providing for medication synchronization, further providing for the Pharmaceutical Assistance Contract for the Elderly Needs Enhancement Tier and for board, providing for medication therapy management and further providing for coordination of benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In pharmaceutical assistance for the elderly, further providing for definitions, providing for medication synchronization, further providing for the Pharmaceutical Assistance Contract for the Elderly Needs Enhancement Tier and for board, providing for medication therapy management and further providing for coordination of benefits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 270 PN 4245, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-11 - House - House Floor: HB 270 PN 4210, FP (Y: 176 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2018-10-10 - House - House Floor: HB 270 PN 949, 2017 A10067, FARRY (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-18SenatePresented to the Governor
2018-10-17SenateSigned in Senate
2018-10-17SenateSigned in House
2018-10-17SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-10-16SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-10-16SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-10-16SenateSecond consideration
2018-10-15SenateFirst consideration
2018-10-15SenateReported as committed
2018-10-15SenateCorrective Reprint, Printer's No. 4245
2018-10-12SenateReferred to AGING AND YOUTH
2018-10-11SenateIn the Senate
2018-10-11HouseThird consideration and final passage (176-0)
2018-10-11HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-10-10HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-10-10HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2018-10-02HouseRemoved from table
2017-06-26HouseLaid on the table
2017-06-26HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-10HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-10HouseFirst consideration
2017-05-10HouseReported as committed
2017-03-16HouseReferred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=270
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0270&pn=0949
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0270&pn=4210
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0270&pn=4245
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=32&theDate=05/10/2017&RollCallId=397
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1526
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1544
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/11/2018&RollCallId=2055
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=1&theDate=10/15/2018&RollCallId=1177
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/16/2018&RollCallId=1213
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=725

Bill Comments

feedback