PA HB27 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 49-9)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 44 (Law and Justice) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, adding provisions for law enforcement activities by providing for release of law enforcement officer information when firearm discharged or use of force.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adding provisions for law enforcement activities by providing for release of law enforcement officer information when firearm discharged or use of force.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Floor: HB 27 PN 350, FP (Y: 157 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor: HB 27 PN 350, 2017 A197, HARRIS, J. (Y: 38 N: 139 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [FAIL]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor: HB 27 PN 350, 2017 A195, HARRIS, J. (Y: 44 N: 135 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor: HB 27 PN 350, 2017 A194, HARRIS, J. (Y: 40 N: 140 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor: HB 27 PN 350, 2017 A193, HARRIS, J. (Y: 45 N: 136 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor: HB 27 PN 350, 2017 A192, HARRIS, J. (Y: 40 N: 141 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor: HB 27 PN 350, 2017 A196, RABB (Y: 44 N: 137 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor: HB 27 PN 350, 2017 A203, MCCLINTON (Y: 45 N: 136 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor: HB 27 PN 350, 2017 A202, MCCLINTON (Y: 49 N: 133 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor: HB 27 PN 350, 2017 A188, DAWKINS (Y: 45 N: 137 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2017-02-07 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-19SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2017-05-09SenateFirst consideration
2017-05-09SenateReported as committed
2017-03-24SenateReferred to LAW AND JUSTICE
2017-03-20SenateIn the Senate
2017-03-20HouseThird consideration and final passage (157-39)
2017-03-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-03-13HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-03-13HouseSecond consideration
2017-02-08HouseRemoved from table
2017-02-07HouseLaid on the table
2017-02-07HouseFirst consideration
2017-02-07HouseReported as committed
2017-02-06HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=27
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0027&pn=0350
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=02/07/2017&RollCallId=50
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=66
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=67
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=68
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=69
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=70
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=71
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=72
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=73
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=74
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=80
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/20/2017&RollCallId=92
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=29&theDate=05/09/2017&RollCallId=158

Bill Comments

feedback