PA HB2686 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-14 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-14 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, providing for Collaborative Care Model and Primary Care Behavioral Health Model Implementation Program; and making an appropriation.
Title
Providing for Collaborative Care Model and Primary Care Behavioral Health Model Implementation Program; and making an appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-14 - House - House Floor: HB 2686 PN 3449, 2021 A5547 (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-09-12 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-12 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A05511 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-12 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A05523 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-12 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-12 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A05511 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-12 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A05523 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-09-14 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2022-09-13 | House | Removed from table |
2022-09-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-09-12 | House | First consideration |
2022-09-12 | House | Reported as amended |
2022-06-20 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |