PA HB2684 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Introduced on July 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of December 19, 1990 (P.L.1234, No.204), known as the Family Caregiver Support Act, further providing for title of act, for intent, for definitions, for primary caregiver support program, for reimbursements, for entitlement not created and for enforcement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for title of act, for intent, for definitions, for primary caregiver support program, for reimbursements, for entitlement not created and for enforcement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-19 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A07102 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - House - House Human Services: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-21HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-10-21HouseSecond consideration
2020-10-20HouseRemoved from table
2020-10-19HouseLaid on the table
2020-10-19HouseFirst consideration
2020-10-19HouseReported as amended
2020-08-28HouseRe-referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES
2020-08-28HouseRe-reported with request to re-refer to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES
2020-07-14HouseReferred to HUMAN SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2684
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2684&pn=4125
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2684&pn=4540
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=56&theDate=07/28/2020&RollCallId=2373
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=32&theDate=10/19/2020&RollCallId=2617
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=32&theDate=10/19/2020&RollCallId=2618

Bill Comments

feedback