PA HB2679 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-11 - Act No. 80 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-11 - Act No. 80 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of September 27, 1961 (P.L.1700, No.699), known as the Pharmacy Act, further providing for authority to administer injectable medications, biologicals and immunizations; and abrogating inconsistent regulations.
Title
Further providing for authority to administer injectable medications, biologicals and immunizations; and abrogating inconsistent regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2679 PN 3252, Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2679 PN 3252, 2021 A5245, CAPPELLETTI Amendment No. A-5245 (Y: 21 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-07-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 2679 PN 3252, FP (Y: 170 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2679 PN 3252, 2021 A5245, CAPPELLETTI Amendment No. A-5245 (Y: 21 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-07-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 2679 PN 3252, FP (Y: 170 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-11 | Senate | Act No. 80 of 2022 |
2022-07-11 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2022-07-08 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Signed in House |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (46-4) |
2022-07-06 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-06-28 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2022-06-27 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-06-27 | House | Third consideration and final passage (170-30) |
2022-06-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-22 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-22 | House | Second consideration |
2022-06-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-20 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2022-06-20 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-20 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-06-15 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |