PA HB267 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Act No. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Act No. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in theft and related offenses, defining the offense of theft of secondary metal; and prescribing penalties.
Title
In theft and related offenses, defining the offense of theft of secondary metal; and prescribing penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 267 PN 226, FINAL PASSAGE RECONSIDERED (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 267 PN 226, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Floor: HB 267 PN 226, FP (Y: 178 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 267 PN 226, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Floor: HB 267 PN 226, FP (Y: 178 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Act No. 8 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Signed in House |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Final passage (45-4) |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Vote on final passage reconsidered |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-05-09 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2017-04-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (178-14) |
2017-04-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-04-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-04-19 | House | Second consideration |
2017-04-05 | House | Removed from table |
2017-04-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-04-04 | House | First consideration |
2017-04-04 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |