PA HB2651 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to provide appropriations from the General Fund for the expenses of the Executive, Legislative and Judicial Departments of the Commonwealth, the public debt and the public schools for the fiscal year July 1, 2022, to June 30, 2023, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022; to provide appropriations from special funds and accounts to the Executive and Judicial Departments for the fiscal year July 1, 2022, to June 30, 2023, and for the payment of bills remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022; and to provide for the appropriation of Federal funds to the Executive and Judicial Departments for the fiscal year July 1, 2022, to June 30, 2023, and for the payment of bills remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022.
Title
To provide appropriations from the General Fund for the expenses of the Executive, Legislative and Judicial Departments of the Commonwealth, the public debt and the public schools for the fiscal year July 1, 2022, to June 30, 2023, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022; to provide appropriations from special funds and accounts to the Executive and Judicial Departments for the fiscal year July 1, 2022, to June 30, 2023, and for the payment of bills remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022; and to provide for the appropriation of Federal funds to the Executive and Judicial Departments for the fiscal year July 1, 2022, to June 30, 2023, and for the payment of bills remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-13 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - House - House Appropriations: To Table A04607 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - House - House Appropriations: To Table A04607 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-09-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-13 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2022-06-13 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-06-08 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |