PA HB2648 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-8)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-07-03 - Referred to RULES
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-07-03 - Referred to RULES
Summary
An Act reenacting and amending the act of July 8, 1986 (P.L.408, No.89), known as the Health Care Cost Containment Act, defining "committee"; further providing for the Health Care Cost Containment Council and its powers and duties, for data submission and collection and for access to council data; providing for the establishment of a Health Care Cost Containment Council Act Review Committee and for sunset of act; providing for abatement under Health Care Provider Retention Program; and making a related repeal.
Title
An Act reenacting and amending the act of July 8, 1986 (P.L.408, No.89), known as the Health Care Cost Containment Act, defining "committee"; further providing for the Health Care Cost Containment Council and its powers and duties, for data submission and collection and for access to council data; providing for the establishment of a Health Care Cost Containment Council Act Review Committee and for sunset of act; providing for abatement under Health Care Provider Retention Program; and making a related repeal.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-07-03 | Referred to RULES | |
2008-07-03 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-07-02 | Re-reported as amended | |
2008-07-01 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-07-01 | Second consideration | |
2008-06-30 | First consideration | |
2008-06-30 | Reported as amended | |
2008-06-30 | Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE | |
2008-06-30 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-06-29 | Second consideration | |
2008-06-29 | Re-reported as committed | |
2008-06-25 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-06-25 | Re-reported as committed | |
2008-06-24 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2008-06-24 | First consideration | |
2008-06-24 | Reported as amended | |
2008-06-18 | Referred to INSURANCE |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2648 |