PA HB2638 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on October 11 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-17 - House non-concurred in Senate amendments (86-95)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of December 8, 2004 (P.L.1801, No.238), known as the Transit Revitalization Investment District Act, in general provisions, further providing for declaration of policy and for definitions; and providing for military installation remediation and for the establishment of the Military Installation Remediation Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In general provisions, further providing for declaration of policy and for definitions; and providing for military installation remediation and for the establishment of the Military Installation Remediation Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-17 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2638 PN 4248, FINAL PASSAGE-RECONSIDERED (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2638 PN 4248, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 2638 PN 4248, CONCUR (Y: 86 N: 95 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2018-10-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-11 - House - House Floor: HB 2638 PN 4211, FP (Y: 165 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-10-10 - House - House Floor: HB 2638 PN 4047, 2017 A9594, MAHER (Y: 149 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A09344 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-17HouseHouse non-concurred in Senate amendments (86-95)
2018-10-17HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2018-10-17HouseReferred to RULES
2018-10-17HouseIn the House
2018-10-17SenateFinal passage (39-10)
2018-10-17SenateVote on final passage reconsidered
2018-10-17SenateThird consideration and final passage (40-9)
2018-10-16SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-10-16SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-10-16SenateSecond consideration
2018-10-15SenateFirst consideration
2018-10-15SenateReported as amended
2018-10-15SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2018-10-11SenateIn the Senate
2018-10-11HouseThird consideration and final passage (165-10)
2018-10-11HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-10-10HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-10-10HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2018-09-25HouseRemoved from table
2018-09-24HouseLaid on the table
2018-09-24HouseFirst consideration
2018-09-24HouseReported as amended
2018-09-12HouseReferred to COMMERCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2638
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2638&pn=3984
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2638&pn=4047
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2638&pn=4211
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2638&pn=4248
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=09/24/2018&RollCallId=1909
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=09/24/2018&RollCallId=1910
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1535
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1546
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/11/2018&RollCallId=2056
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=10/15/2018&RollCallId=1182
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/16/2018&RollCallId=1227
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1636
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=750
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=751
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=10/17/2018&RollCallId=2113

Bill Comments

feedback