PA HB263 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on November 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-21 - Act No. 168
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on November 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-21 - Act No. 168
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in hunting and furtaking, further providing for unlawful devices and methods; and, in hunting and furtaking licenses, further providing for elk hunting licenses.
Title
In hunting and furtaking, further providing for unlawful devices and methods; and, in hunting and furtaking licenses, further providing for elk hunting licenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Gabler [R] | Rep. Martin Causer [R] | Rep. Carl Metzgar [R] | Rep. Gerald Mullery [D] |
Rep. William Kortz [D] | Rep. Dan Moul [R] | Rep. Michael Hanna [D] | Rep. Barry Jozwiak [R] |
Sen. Cris Dush [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-10-27 - House - House Floor: HB 263 PN 4122, CONCUR (Y: 160 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 263 PN 4122, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 263 PN 2535, A10305, HUTCHINSON AMENDMENT NO. A-10305 (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 263 PN 267, A3819, SCARNATI AMENDMENT NO. A-3819 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Floor: HB 263 PN 267, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 263 PN 4122, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 263 PN 2535, A10305, HUTCHINSON AMENDMENT NO. A-10305 (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 263 PN 267, A3819, SCARNATI AMENDMENT NO. A-3819 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Floor: HB 263 PN 267, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-21 | House | Act No. 168 |
2016-11-21 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2016-11-14 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2016-11-09 | House | Signed in Senate |
2016-10-27 | House | Signed in House |
2016-10-27 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (160-25) |
2016-10-26 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2016-10-26 | House | Referred to RULES |
2016-10-26 | House | In the House |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (40-7) |
2016-10-25 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (37-11) |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Removed from table |
2015-11-24 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2015-11-16 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2015-10-19 | Senate | Removed from table |
2015-10-19 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2015-07-13 | Senate | Removed from table |
2015-07-13 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2015-06-16 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |
2015-04-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-04-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2015-04-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-04-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-04-21 | House | Second consideration |
2015-04-20 | House | Removed from table |
2015-04-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-04-15 | House | First consideration |
2015-04-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |