PA HB2626 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-4)
Status: Passed on October 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-25 - Act No. 206
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-4)
Status: Passed on October 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-25 - Act No. 206
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act establishing the Promoting Employment Across Pennsylvania Program; and providing for tax benefits to qualified companies in the form of withholding tax relief.
Title
Establishing the Promoting Employment Across Pennsylvania Program; and providing for tax benefits to qualified companies in the form of withholding tax relief.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-10-17 - House - HB 2626 PN 4226, CONCUR (Y: 111 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-10-17 - Senate - HB 2626 PN 4226, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-16 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-15 - House - HB 2626 PN 4170, FP (Y: 142 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-10-15 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-02 - House - HB 2626 PN 3997, 2011 A13402, DAVIS (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-10-02 - House - HB 2626 PN 3997, 2011 A13517, MOT GERMANE, BENNINGHOFF (Y: 76 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2012-10-02 - House - HB 2626 PN 3997, 2011 A13255, MOT GERMANE, BENNINGHOFF (Y: 86 N: 105 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2012-10-02 - House - HB 2626 PN 3997, 2011 A13275, BOYD (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-10-02 - House - HB 2626 PN 3997, 2011 A13483, MUNDY (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-10-17 - Senate - HB 2626 PN 4226, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-16 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-15 - House - HB 2626 PN 4170, FP (Y: 142 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-10-15 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-02 - House - HB 2626 PN 3997, 2011 A13402, DAVIS (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-10-02 - House - HB 2626 PN 3997, 2011 A13517, MOT GERMANE, BENNINGHOFF (Y: 76 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2012-10-02 - House - HB 2626 PN 3997, 2011 A13255, MOT GERMANE, BENNINGHOFF (Y: 86 N: 105 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2012-10-02 - House - HB 2626 PN 3997, 2011 A13275, BOYD (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-10-02 - House - HB 2626 PN 3997, 2011 A13483, MUNDY (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-25 | House | Act No. 206 |
2012-10-25 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2012-10-18 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2012-10-18 | House | Signed in Senate |
2012-10-17 | House | Signed in House |
2012-10-17 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (111-80) |
2012-10-17 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2012-10-17 | House | Referred to RULES |
2012-10-17 | House | In the House |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (33-16) |
2012-10-16 | Senate | Second consideration |
2012-10-16 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2012-10-15 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-10-15 | Senate | First consideration |
2012-10-15 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2012-10-15 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2012-10-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2012-10-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (142-55) |
2012-10-03 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-10-02 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-10-02 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2012-10-01 | House | Removed from table |
2012-09-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-09-25 | House | First consideration |
2012-09-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2012-09-05 | House | Referred to FINANCE |