PA HB262 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-08 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-08 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, providing for municipal authority to establish maximum saturation ratios for licensed establishments.
Title
Providing for municipal authority to establish maximum saturation ratios for licensed establishments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-05-08 | House | Removed from table |
2013-03-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-03-18 | House | First consideration |
2013-03-18 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL |