PA HB26 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-9)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-02 - Re-reported as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in registration of vehicles, further providing for antique, classic and collectible plates and for special registration plates, providing for distracted driving awareness plate, further providing for special plates for veterans and providing for special plates for recipients of Soldier's Medal, for special plates for recipients of Presidential Service Badge and for special plates for veterans of an ally foreign country; and, in fees, further providing for exemption of persons, entities and vehicles from fees and for fee for local use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In registration of vehicles, further providing for antique, classic and collectible plates and for special registration plates, providing for distracted driving awareness plate, further providing for special plates for veterans and providing for special plates for recipients of Soldier's Medal, for special plates for recipients of Presidential Service Badge and for special plates for veterans of an ally foreign country; and, in fees, further providing for exemption of persons, entities and vehicles from fees and for fee for local use.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 26 PN 2010, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A01656 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A01656 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-02SenateRe-reported as amended
2018-10-01SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-10-01SenateSecond consideration, with amendments
2018-09-26SenateRemoved from table
2018-09-26SenateLaid on the table
2018-06-11SenateRemoved from table
2018-06-11SenateLaid on the table
2018-04-18SenateRemoved from table
2018-04-18SenateLaid on the table
2018-01-31SenateFirst consideration
2018-01-31SenateReported as committed
2017-07-06SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2017-06-27SenateIn the Senate
2017-06-27HouseThird consideration and final passage (197-0)
2017-06-27HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-26HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-26HouseSecond consideration
2017-06-26HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-14HouseRe-committed to RULES
2017-06-14HouseFirst consideration
2017-06-14HouseReported as amended
2017-03-28HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=26
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0026&pn=1142
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0026&pn=2010
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0026&pn=4135
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0026&pn=4146
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=06/14/2017&RollCallId=638
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=06/14/2017&RollCallId=637
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=06/13/2017&RollCallId=638
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=06/13/2017&RollCallId=637
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/26/2017&RollCallId=739
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/27/2017&RollCallId=744
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=553
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=01/31/2018&RollCallId=662
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/02/2018&RollCallId=1165

Bill Comments

feedback