PA HB256 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Passed on July 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-23 - Act No. 63
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Passed on July 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-23 - Act No. 63
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in assault, further providing for the offense of assault by prisoner; in sexual offenses, further providing for the offense of institutional sexual assault; and, in registration of sexual offenders, further providing for sexual offenses and tier system.
Title
In assault, further providing for the offense of assault by prisoner; in sexual offenses, further providing for the offense of institutional sexual assault; and, in registration of sexual offenders, further providing for sexual offenses and tier system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-07 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 256 PN 4054, CONCUR (Y: 173 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 256 PN 4054, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 256 PN 4021, A6480, REGAN AMENDMENT NO. A-6480 (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-18 - House - House Floor: HB 256 PN 2919, FP (Y: 146 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03155 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 256 PN 4054, CONCUR (Y: 173 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 256 PN 4054, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 256 PN 4021, A6480, REGAN AMENDMENT NO. A-6480 (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-18 - House - House Floor: HB 256 PN 2919, FP (Y: 146 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03155 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | House | Act No. 63 |
2020-07-23 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2020-07-13 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2020-07-13 | House | Signed in Senate |
2020-07-07 | House | Signed in House |
2020-07-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (173-28) |
2020-07-07 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2020-07-07 | House | Referred to RULES |
2020-06-30 | House | In the House |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments (36-14) |
2020-06-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-12-26 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2019-12-18 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-12-18 | House | Third consideration and final passage (146-51) |
2019-12-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-12-17 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-12-17 | House | Second consideration |
2019-11-21 | House | Removed from table |
2019-11-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-19 | House | First consideration |
2019-11-19 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |