PA HB2557 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 124
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An act establishing intergovernmental cooperation authorities for certain cities of the third class; providing for powers and duties; and making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act establishing intergovernmental cooperation authorities for certain cities of the third class; providing for powers and duties; and making an appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2557 PN 4247, FINAL PASSAGE-RECONSIDERED (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2557 PN 4247, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - House - House Floor: HB 2557 PN 4196, FP (Y: 185 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - House - House Floor: HB 2557 PN 4196, 2017 A10338, KIM (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A10077 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended A10077 (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-24SenateAct No. 124
2018-10-24SenateApproved by the Governor
2018-10-18SenatePresented to the Governor
2018-10-17SenateSigned in Senate
2018-10-17SenateSigned in House
2018-10-17SenateFinal passage (46-3)
2018-10-17SenateVote on final passage reconsidered
2018-10-17SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-1)
2018-10-16SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-10-16SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-10-16SenateSecond consideration
2018-10-15SenateFirst consideration
2018-10-15SenateReported as committed
2018-10-15SenateReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2018-10-15SenateIn the Senate
2018-10-15HouseFinal passage (185-5)
2018-10-15HouseThird consideration, with amendments
2018-10-15HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-10-11HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-10-11HouseSecond consideration
2018-10-10HouseRemoved from table
2018-10-09HouseLaid on the table
2018-10-09HouseFirst consideration
2018-10-09HouseReported as amended
2018-10-02HouseReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2557
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2557&pn=4139
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2557&pn=4196
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2557&pn=4247
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=10/09/2018&RollCallId=2025
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=10/09/2018&RollCallId=2034
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1549
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1550
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=15&theDate=10/15/2018&RollCallId=1192
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/15/2018&RollCallId=2063
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/16/2018&RollCallId=1226
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=718
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=752

Bill Comments

feedback