PA HB2547 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-11-23 - Act No. 122
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-11-23 - Act No. 122
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 7 (Banks and Banking) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for definitions and for exceptions to license requirements.
Title
Further providing for definitions and for exceptions to license requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-10-14 - Senate - HB 2547 PN 3826, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - House - HB 2547 PN 3826, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - House - HB 2547 PN 3826, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-23 | Act No. 122 | |
2010-11-23 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-11-17 | Presented to the Governor | |
2010-11-17 | Signed in Senate | |
2010-10-18 | Signed in House | |
2010-10-14 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-10-13 | Second consideration | |
2010-10-13 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-10-12 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-09-21 | First consideration | |
2010-09-21 | Reported as committed | |
2010-06-29 | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE | |
2010-06-28 | In the Senate | |
2010-06-28 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-06-24 | Second consideration | |
2010-06-24 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-06-23 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-06-23 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-06-09 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2010-06-09 | First consideration | |
2010-06-09 | Reported as committed | |
2010-05-27 | Referred to COMMERCE |