PA HB2544 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-31 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-31 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, providing for emergency COVID-19 provisions.
Title
Providing for emergency COVID-19 provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-26 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A05850 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A05850 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-31 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-08-31 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-26 | House | First consideration |
2020-05-26 | House | Reported as amended |
2020-05-21 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |