PA HB2542 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-06-25 - Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-06-25 - Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act providing for additional debt authorization for the 2007-2008 fiscal year.
Title
An Act providing for additional debt authorization for the 2007-2008 fiscal year.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-06-25 | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-06-23 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-06-11 | Second consideration | |
2008-06-09 | Re-reported as committed | |
2008-05-14 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-05-14 | Removed from table | |
2008-05-14 | Laid on the table | |
2008-05-14 | First consideration | |
2008-05-14 | Reported as committed | |
2008-05-13 | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2542 |