PA HB2536 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-23 - Act No. 114
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in emergency COVID-19 response, further providing for money in account and providing for municipalities; in financially distressed municipalities, providing for local services tax; in special funds, further providing for disposition of Budget Stabilization Reserve Fund; in additional special funds and restricted accounts, further providing for return of COVID-19 response transfers and providing for Workers' Compensation Security Fund transfer; in general budget implementation, further providing for Department of Community and Economic Development, for Department of Conservation and Natural Resources, for Department of Environmental Protection, for Department of General Services, for Pennsylvania Gaming Control Board, for Department of Health, for Department of Military and Veterans Affairs, for Department of Human Services and for Department of Revenue and providing for legislative department and for Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission; further providing for 2020-2021 budget implementation and for 2020-2021 restrictions on appropriations for funds and accounts; making related repeals; and making editorial changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In emergency COVID-19 response, further providing for money in account and providing for municipalities; in financially distressed municipalities, providing for local services tax; in special funds, further providing for disposition of Budget Stabilization Reserve Fund; in additional special funds and restricted accounts, further providing for return of COVID-19 response transfers and providing for Workers' Compensation Security Fund transfer; in general budget implementation, further providing for Department of Community and Economic Development, for Department of Conservation and Natural Resources, for Department of Environmental Protection, for Department of General Services, for Pennsylvania Gaming Control Board, for Department of Health, for Department of Military and Veterans Affairs, for Department of Human Services and for Department of Revenue and providing for legislative department and for Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission; further providing for 2020-2021 budget implementation and for 2020-2021 restrictions on appropriations for funds and accounts; making related repeals; and making editorial changes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-11-20 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2536 PN 4626, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2536 PN 4626, A7945, MUTH AMENDMENT NO. A-7945 (Y: 19 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2536 PN 4626, CONCUR (Y: 108 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-11-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Floor: HB 2536 PN 3813, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-23HouseAct No. 114
2020-11-23HouseApproved by the Governor
2020-11-20HousePresented to the Governor
2020-11-20HouseSigned in Senate
2020-11-20HouseSigned in House
2020-11-20HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (108-92)
2020-11-20HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2020-11-20HouseReferred to RULES
2020-11-20HouseIn the House
2020-11-20SenateThird consideration and final passage (33-16)
2020-11-20SenateRe-reported as amended
2020-09-09SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-09-09SenateSecond consideration
2020-09-08SenateFirst consideration
2020-09-08SenateReported as amended
2020-06-29SenateReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2020-06-23SenateIn the Senate
2020-06-23HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2020-06-23HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-06-10HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-06-10HouseSecond consideration
2020-06-09HouseRemoved from table
2020-05-27HouseLaid on the table
2020-05-27HouseFirst consideration
2020-05-27HouseReported as committed
2020-05-21HouseReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2536
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2536&pn=3813
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2536&pn=4341
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2536&pn=4626
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=05/27/2020&RollCallId=2086
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1443
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/23/2020&RollCallId=2288
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=15&theDate=09/08/2020&RollCallId=1089
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=11/20/2020&RollCallId=1304
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1765
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=774
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=775
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=11/20/2020&RollCallId=2661

Bill Comments

feedback