PA HB2520 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 3 (Agriculture) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in race horse industry reform, further providing for State Horse Racing Commission.
Title
In race horse industry reform, further providing for State Horse Racing Commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Martin Causer [R] | Rep. Dan Moul [R] | Rep. Eddie Pashinski [D] | Rep. Timothy Hennessey [R] |
Rep. Barry Jozwiak [R] | Rep. David Zimmerman [R] | Rep. Johnathan Hershey [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House Floor: HB 2520 PN 2999, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House Floor: HB 2520 PN 2999, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2022-05-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-05-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2022-05-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-05-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-05-24 | House | Second consideration |
2022-05-23 | House | Removed from table |
2022-04-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-04-27 | House | First consideration |
2022-04-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-04-14 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |