PA HB2513 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 44-5)
Status: Vetoed on October 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-20 - Motion to override the Governor's Veto defeated, and the Governor's Veto sustained Oct. 20, 2020 (133-69)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, providing for establishment operation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for establishment operation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2513 PN 4340, MOT OVERRIDE, BENNINGHOFF (Y: 133 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - House - House Floor: HB 2513 PN 4340, CONCUR (Y: 145 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2513 PN 4340, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-08 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2513 PN 3778, FP (Y: 117 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Floor: HB 2513 PN 3750, 2019 A5737, EVERETT (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Floor: HB 2513 PN 3750, 2019 A5641, EVERETT (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-20SenateMotion to override the Governor's Veto defeated, and the Governor's Veto sustained Oct. 20, 2020 (133-69)
2020-10-16SenateIn the House
2020-10-16HouseVeto No. 13
2020-10-16HouseVetoed by the Governor
2020-10-06HousePresented to the Governor
2020-10-05HouseSigned in Senate
2020-09-23HouseSigned in House
2020-09-23HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (145-56)
2020-09-23HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2020-09-23HouseReferred to RULES
2020-09-22HouseIn the House
2020-09-22SenateThird consideration and final passage (43-6)
2020-09-09SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-09-09SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-09-09SenateSecond consideration
2020-09-08SenateFirst consideration
2020-09-08SenateReported as amended
2020-05-26SenateReferred to LAW AND JUSTICE
2020-05-19SenateIn the Senate
2020-05-19HouseThird consideration and final passage (117-85)
2020-05-19HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-05-18HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-05-18HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2020-05-14HouseRemoved from table
2020-05-13HouseLaid on the table
2020-05-13HouseFirst consideration
2020-05-13HouseReported as committed
2020-05-13HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2513
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2513&pn=3750
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2513&pn=3778
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2513&pn=4340
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=05/13/2020&RollCallId=1952
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1277
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1278
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1308
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/19/2020&RollCallId=2039
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=29&theDate=09/08/2020&RollCallId=1081
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=09/09/2020&RollCallId=1123
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=644
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1614
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=09/23/2020&RollCallId=2499
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1688

Bill Comments

feedback