PA HB2510 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 46-3)
Status: Passed on May 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-29 - Act No. 24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, providing for regional response health collaboration and for emergency COVID-19 response; and, in additional special funds and restricted accounts, providing for return of COVID response transfers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for regional response health collaboration and for emergency COVID-19 response; and, in additional special funds and restricted accounts, providing for return of COVID response transfers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-28 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2510 PN 3866, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Floor: HB 2510 PN 3866, CONCUR (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2510 PN 3799, FP (Y: 201 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2510 PN 3735, 2019 A5630, TURZAI (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2510 PN 3735, 2019 A5766, TURZAI (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A05609 (Y: 15 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-13 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-29HouseAct No. 24
2020-05-29HouseApproved by the Governor
2020-05-28HousePresented to the Governor
2020-05-28HouseSigned in Senate
2020-05-28HouseSigned in House
2020-05-28HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (202-0)
2020-05-28HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2020-05-28HouseReferred to RULES
2020-05-28HouseIn the House
2020-05-28SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2020-05-28SenateRe-reported as amended
2020-05-27SenateRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-05-27SenateSecond consideration
2020-05-26SenateFirst consideration
2020-05-26SenateReported as committed
2020-05-25SenateReferred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-05-20SenateIn the Senate
2020-05-20HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-1)
2020-05-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-05-19HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-05-19HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2020-05-13HouseRemoved from table
2020-05-13HouseLaid on the table
2020-05-13HouseFirst consideration
2020-05-13HouseReported as committed
2020-05-12HouseReferred to APPROPRIATIONS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2510
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2510&pn=3735
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2510&pn=3799
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2510&pn=3866
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/13/2020&RollCallId=1957
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/13/2020&RollCallId=1956
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1294
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1295
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1319
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/20/2020&RollCallId=2050
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=05/26/2020&RollCallId=891
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1374
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=504
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=05/28/2020&RollCallId=909
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=05/28/2020&RollCallId=2125

Bill Comments

feedback