PA HB251 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-10-19 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in powers and duties of the Department of General Services and its departmental administrative and advisory boards and commissions, providing for program for sale of used pursuit vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In powers and duties of the Department of General Services and its departmental administrative and advisory boards and commissions, providing for program for sale of used pursuit vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-10-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-03 - House - House Floor: HB 251 PN 214, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-02 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-02 - House - House Floor: HB 251 PN 214, 2023 A1376, MOTION TO APPEAL RULING OF THE CHAIR (Y: 102 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-02 - House - House Floor: HB 251 PN 214, 2023 A2069, MOTION TO APPEAL RULING OF THE CHAIR (Y: 102 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-19SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2023-10-03SenateIn the Senate
2023-10-03HouseThird consideration and final passage (203-0)
2023-10-03HouseRe-reported as committed
2023-10-02HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2023-10-02HouseSecond consideration
2023-10-02HouseRe-reported as committed
2023-09-22HouseRe-committed to RULES
2023-09-22HouseRemoved from table
2023-09-22HouseLaid on the table
2023-09-22HouseRe-reported as committed
2023-06-28HouseRe-committed to RULES
2023-06-28HouseFirst consideration
2023-06-28HouseReported as committed
2023-03-10HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2023&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=251
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0251&pn=0214
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2023&sInd=0&body=H&type=B&bn=0251&pn=0214&aYear=2023&an=02069
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2023&sInd=0&body=H&type=B&bn=0251&pn=0214&aYear=2023&an=01376
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2023/0/HB0251P0214.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=06/28/2023&RollCallId=691
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=537
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=538
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=67&theDate=10/02/2023&RollCallId=850
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=557
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=62&theDate=10/03/2023&RollCallId=912

Bill Comments

feedback