PA HB2505 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-25 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-25 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, providing for COVID-19 record retention.
Title
Providing for COVID-19 record retention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2505 PN 3775, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Floor: HB 2505 PN 3733, 2019 A5628, ECKER (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2505 PN 3775, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Floor: HB 2505 PN 3733, 2019 A5628, ECKER (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-25 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2020-05-19 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-05-19 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-05-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-05-18 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-05-18 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2020-05-14 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-13 | House | First consideration |
2020-05-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-05-12 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |