PA HB2503 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-10-19 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in child protective services, further providing for employees having contact with children and adoptive and foster parents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In child protective services, further providing for employees having contact with children and adoptive and foster parents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Floor: HB 2503 PN 3925, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Floor: HB 2503 PN 3861, 2019 A6102, B. MILLER (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Children And Youth: Adopt Amendment A05805 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Children And Youth: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-19SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-10-19SenateSecond consideration
2020-09-22SenateFirst consideration
2020-09-22SenateReported as committed
2020-07-01SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2020-06-23SenateIn the Senate
2020-06-23HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2020-06-23HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-06-10HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-06-10HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2020-06-09HouseRemoved from table
2020-05-27HouseLaid on the table
2020-05-27HouseFirst consideration
2020-05-27HouseReported as amended
2020-05-12HouseReferred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2503
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2503&pn=3732
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2503&pn=3861
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2503&pn=3925
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=48&theDate=05/27/2020&RollCallId=2111
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=48&theDate=05/27/2020&RollCallId=2114
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=48&theDate=05/27/2020&RollCallId=2115
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1411
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1439
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/23/2020&RollCallId=2286
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=33&theDate=09/22/2020&RollCallId=1150

Bill Comments

feedback