PA HB2502 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Act No. 35
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Act No. 35
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in powers and duties of the Department of State and its departmental administrative board, providing for report on implementation of 2020 general primary election.
Title
In powers and duties of the Department of State and its departmental administrative board, providing for report on implementation of 2020 general primary election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2502 PN 3774, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2502 PN 3774, A6177, SANTARSIERO AMENDMENT NO. A-6177 (Y: 21 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2502 PN 3774, A6123, HAYWOOD AMENDMENT NO. A-6123 (Y: 21 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2502 PN 3774, FP (Y: 201 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Floor: HB 2502 PN 3731, 2019 A5650, EVERETT (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2502 PN 3774, A6177, SANTARSIERO AMENDMENT NO. A-6177 (Y: 21 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2502 PN 3774, A6123, HAYWOOD AMENDMENT NO. A-6123 (Y: 21 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2502 PN 3774, FP (Y: 201 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Floor: HB 2502 PN 3731, 2019 A5650, EVERETT (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | Senate | Act No. 35 |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Signed in House |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-06-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-05-25 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2020-05-19 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-05-19 | House | Third consideration and final passage, May 19, 2020 ( 201-1) |
2020-05-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-05-18 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-05-18 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2020-05-14 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-13 | House | First consideration |
2020-05-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-05-12 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |