PA HB250 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 77-15-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in educational tax credits, further providing for limitations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In educational tax credits, further providing for limitations.

Sponsors

Rep. Michael Turzai [R]Rep. Joanna McClinton [D]Rep. Matthew Baker [R]Rep. Stephen Barrar [R]
Rep. Stephen Bloom [R]Rep. Vanessa Brown [D]Rep. Martin Causer [R]Rep. Rebecca Corbin [R]
Rep. Dominic Costa [D]Rep. Jim Cox [R]Rep. Bryan Cutler [R]Rep. Daniel Deasy [D]
Rep. Russ Diamond [R]Rep. Michael Driscoll [D]Rep. George Dunbar [R]Rep. Brian Ellis [R]
Rep. Joseph Emrick [R]Rep. Harold English [R]Rep. Frank Farry [R]Rep. Melinda Fee [R]
Rep. Jonathan Fritz [R]Rep. Matthew Gabler [R]Rep. Mark Gillen [R]Rep. Keith Greiner [R]
Rep. Seth Grove [R]Rep. Kate Harper [R]Rep. Christopher Harris [R]Rep. Jordan Harris [D]
Rep. Doyle Heffley [R]Rep. Timothy Hennessey [R]Rep. David Hickernell [R]Rep. Kristin Phillips-Hill [R]
Rep. Robert Kauffman [R]Rep. Mark Keller [R]Rep. William Keller [D]Rep. Jerome Knowles [?]
Rep. William Kortz [D]Rep. John Lawrence [R]Rep. Ryan Mackenzie [R]Rep. David Maloney [R]
Rep. Ron Marsico [R]Rep. Kurt Masser [R]Rep. John McGinnis [R]Rep. Steven Mentzer [R]
Rep. David Millard [R]Rep. Brett Miller [R]Rep. Thomas Mustio [R]Rep. Eric Nelson [R]
Rep. Tedd Nesbit [R]Rep. Donna Oberlander [R]Rep. Jason Ortitay [R]Rep. Tina Pickett [R]
Rep. Jeffrey Pyle [R]Rep. Thomas Quigley [R]Rep. Kathy Rapp [R]Rep. Harry Readshaw [D]
Rep. Michael Reese [R]Rep. Eric Roe [R]Rep. Mark Rozzi [D]Rep. Richard Saccone [R]
Rep. Thomas Sankey [R]Rep. Stanley Saylor [R]Rep. Paul Schemel [R]Rep. Justin Simmons [R]
Rep. Curtis Sonney [R]Rep. Craig Staats [R]Rep. Will Tallman [R]Rep. John Taylor [R]
Rep. Michael Tobash [R]Rep. Marcy Toepel [R]Rep. Jesse Topper [R]Rep. Judith Ward [R]
Rep. Ryan Warner [R]Rep. Katharine Watson [R]Rep. Jeff Wheeland [R]Rep. David Zimmerman [R]
Rep. Garth Everett [R]Rep. Robert Godshall [R]Rep. Marguerite Quinn [R]Rep. Francis Ryan [R]
Rep. Cris Dush [R]Rep. Christopher Quinn [R]Rep. James Marshall [?]Rep. James Santora [R]
Rep. Lynda Schlegel Culver [R]Rep. Tina Davis [D]Rep. Bryan Barbin [D]Rep. Maria Donatucci [D]
Rep. Anita Kulik [D]Rep. Eli Evankovich [R]Rep. Matthew Dowling [R]Rep. Susan Helm [R]
Rep. Barry Jozwiak [R]Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D]

Roll Calls

2017-03-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor: HB 250 PN 211, FP (Y: 147 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Floor: HB 250 PN 211, 2017 A158, THOMAS (Y: 66 N: 133 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-02-06 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-20SenateReferred to EDUCATION
2017-03-13SenateIn the Senate
2017-03-13HouseThird consideration and final passage (147-39)
2017-03-13HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-02-08HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-02-08HouseSecond consideration
2017-02-07HouseRemoved from table
2017-02-06HouseLaid on the table
2017-02-06HouseFirst consideration
2017-02-06HouseReported as committed
2017-01-31HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=250
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0250&pn=0211
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=02/06/2017&RollCallId=18
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=39
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=59
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/13/2017&RollCallId=89

Bill Comments

feedback