PA HB25 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-12)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-30 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: Senate Labor & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for school-to-work pilot programs; establishing the CareerBound Program; providing for a tax credit; and imposing powers and duties on the Department of Labor and Industry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for school-to-work pilot programs; establishing the CareerBound Program; providing for a tax credit; and imposing powers and duties on the Department of Labor and Industry.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Floor: HB 25 PN 188, FP (Y: 194 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-30SenateReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
2018-04-16SenateIn the Senate
2018-04-16HouseThird consideration and final passage (194-1)
2018-04-16HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-05HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-05HouseSecond consideration
2017-05-24HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-23HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-23HouseFirst consideration
2017-05-23HouseReported as committed
2017-01-31HouseReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback