PA HB2499 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on September 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-21 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-21 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 40 (Insurance) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in regulation of insurers and related persons generally, providing for insurance data security; in reserve liabilities, repealing provisions relating to small company exemption and providing for adoption of exemption standards of NAIC Valuation Manual; and establishing penalties.
Title
In regulation of insurers and related persons generally, providing for insurance data security; in reserve liabilities, repealing provisions relating to small company exemption and providing for adoption of exemption standards of NAIC Valuation Manual; and establishing penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2499 PN 3448, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-12 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-12 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A05515 (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2499 PN 3448, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-12 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-12 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A05515 (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-09-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-09-19 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |
2022-09-19 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-09-19 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2022-09-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-09-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-09-14 | House | Second consideration |
2022-09-13 | House | Removed from table |
2022-09-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-09-12 | House | First consideration |
2022-09-12 | House | Reported as amended |
2022-04-08 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |