PA HB2493 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-08 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-08 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in organization of departmental administrative boards and commissions and of advisory boards and commissions, further providing for State Planning Board.
Title
In organization of departmental administrative boards and commissions and of advisory boards and commissions, further providing for State Planning Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-08 | House | Second consideration |
2022-06-07 | House | Removed from table |
2022-05-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-05-25 | House | First consideration |
2022-05-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-04-06 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |