PA HB2489 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-17 - Referred to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-17 - Referred to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the release of Project 70 restrictions on certain lands owned by the Borough of Topton, Berks County, in exchange for the imposition of Project 70 restrictions on other lands to be acquired by the Borough of Topton, Berks County; authorizing the release of Project 70 restrictions on certain lands owned by the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, acting by and through the Department of Conservation and Natural Resources, in exchange for the imposition of Project 70 restrictions on other lands to be acquired by the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, acting by and through the Department of Conservation and Natural Resources; and authorizing the transfer of title for certain Project 70 lands owned by Lehigh County to Whitehall Township, Lehigh County; authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Department of Military and Veterans Affairs and the Governor, to grant and convey to Monroe County Municipal Waste Management Authority, or its successors or assigns, certain lands, buildings and improvements situate in Stroud Township, Monroe County; and authorizing the Department of General Services and East Stroudsburg University of the State System of Higher Education, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to East Stroudsburg Borough, a certain permanent public sanitary sewer easement and certain permanent public water supply system easements situate in East Stroudsburg Borough, Monroe County.
Title
Authorizing the release of Project 70 restrictions on certain lands owned by the Borough of Topton, Berks County, in exchange for the imposition of Project 70 restrictions on other lands to be acquired by the Borough of Topton, Berks County; authorizing the release of Project 70 restrictions on certain lands owned by the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, acting by and through the Department of Conservation and Natural Resources, in exchange for the imposition of Project 70 restrictions on other lands to be acquired by the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, acting by and through the Department of Conservation and Natural Resources; and authorizing the transfer of title for certain Project 70 lands owned by Lehigh County to Whitehall Township, Lehigh County; authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Department of Military and Veterans Affairs and the Governor, to grant and convey to Monroe County Municipal Waste Management Authority, or its successors or assigns, certain lands, buildings and improvements situate in Stroud Township, Monroe County; and authorizing the Department of General Services and East Stroudsburg University of the State System of Higher Education, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to East Stroudsburg Borough, a certain permanent public sanitary sewer easement and certain permanent public water supply system easements situate in East Stroudsburg Borough, Monroe County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2489 PN 4302, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2489 PN 4052, A10433, SCAVELLO AMENDMENT NO. A-10433 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 2489 PN 3691, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2489 PN 4052, A10433, SCAVELLO AMENDMENT NO. A-10433 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 2489 PN 3691, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-17 | House | Referred to RULES |
2018-10-17 | House | In the House |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (49-0) |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-09-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-09-24 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2018-06-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-06-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2018-06-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-21 | House | Second consideration |
2018-06-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-19 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2018-06-19 | House | First consideration |
2018-06-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-06-14 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |