PA HB2476 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in health care outcomes, further providing for establishment, for value-based models relating to the Hospital Outcomes Program, for value-based models relating to the Managed Care Organization Outcomes Program and for managed care organization Medicaid contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In health care outcomes, further providing for establishment, for value-based models relating to the Hospital Outcomes Program, for value-based models relating to the Managed Care Organization Outcomes Program and for managed care organization Medicaid contracts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-29 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-29 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A07392 (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-30HouseRemoved from table
2020-09-29HouseLaid on the table
2020-09-29HouseFirst consideration
2020-09-29HouseReported as committed
2020-04-30HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback