PA HB2471 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-27 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-27 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of February 14, 2008 (P.L.6, No.3), known as the Right-to-Know Law, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in procedure, further providing for written requests; in agency response, further providing for extension of time; and, in judicial review, further providing for Commonwealth agencies, legislative agencies and judicial agencies, for local agencies and for Office of Open Records.
Title
In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in procedure, further providing for written requests; in agency response, further providing for extension of time; and, in judicial review, further providing for Commonwealth agencies, legislative agencies and judicial agencies, for local agencies and for Office of Open Records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-13 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A04023 (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A04023 (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-27 | House | Removed from table |
2022-04-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-04-13 | House | First consideration |
2022-04-13 | House | Reported as amended |
2022-04-04 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |