PA HB2470 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-29 - Act No. 11A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act making an appropriation from a restricted revenue account within the General Fund to the Office of Consumer Advocate in the Office of Attorney General.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making an appropriation from a restricted revenue account within the General Fund to the Office of Consumer Advocate in the Office of Attorney General.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2470 PN 3841, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A05832 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House Floor: HB 2470 PN 3841, FP (Y: 200 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-29SenateAct No. 11A
2020-05-29SenateApproved by the Governor
2020-05-28SenatePresented to the Governor
2020-05-28SenateSigned in Senate
2020-05-28SenateSigned in House
2020-05-28SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2020-05-27SenateSecond consideration
2020-05-26SenateFirst consideration
2020-05-26SenateReported as committed
2020-05-26SenateReferred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-05-26SenateIn the Senate
2020-05-26HouseThird consideration and final passage (200-2)
2020-05-26HouseRe-reported as amended
2020-05-14HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-05-14HouseSecond consideration
2020-05-05HouseRemoved from table
2020-05-04HouseLaid on the table
2020-05-04HouseFirst consideration
2020-05-04HouseReported as committed
2020-04-30HouseReferred to APPROPRIATIONS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2470
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2470&pn=3683
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2470&pn=3841
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/04/2020&RollCallId=1927
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1358
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=05/26/2020&RollCallId=885
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=489
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/26/2020&RollCallId=2141
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/26/2020&RollCallId=2140

Bill Comments

feedback