PA HB247 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-28 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 58 (Oil and Gas) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in development, further providing for well permits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In development, further providing for well permits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A00317 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A00305 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-28HouseRemoved from table
2019-10-28HouseLaid on the table
2019-06-20HouseRemoved from table
2019-06-20HouseLaid on the table
2019-05-08HouseRemoved from table
2019-05-08HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-20HouseRemoved from table
2019-03-19HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-19HouseFirst consideration
2019-03-19HouseReported as amended
2019-01-28HouseReferred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=247
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0247&pn=0216
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0247&pn=0999
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=8&theDate=03/19/2019&RollCallId=137
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=8&theDate=03/19/2019&RollCallId=138
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=8&theDate=03/19/2019&RollCallId=139

Bill Comments

feedback